Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3449 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 10, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 11, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2021
Bill May 1, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 17, 2021
Analysis April 30, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 16, 2021
Fiscal Note April 27, 2021
Fiscal Note April 9, 2021