1 | | - | H.B. No. 3452 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: White (Senate Sponsor - Buckingham) H.B. No. 3452 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2021; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal |
---|
| 4 | + | Justice; May 22, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote: |
---|
| 5 | + | Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 22, 2021, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 6 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
4 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 11 | | relating to granting limited state law enforcement authority to |
---|
6 | 12 | | certain federal special agents. |
---|
7 | 13 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 14 | | SECTION 1. Article 2.122(a), Code of Criminal Procedure, is |
---|
9 | 15 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 16 | | (a) The following named criminal investigators of the |
---|
11 | 17 | | United States shall not be deemed peace officers, but shall have the |
---|
12 | 18 | | powers of arrest, search, and seizure under the laws of this state |
---|
13 | 19 | | as to felony offenses only: |
---|
14 | 20 | | (1) Special Agents of the Federal Bureau of |
---|
15 | 21 | | Investigation; |
---|
16 | 22 | | (2) Special Agents of the Secret Service; |
---|
17 | 23 | | (3) Special Agents of the United States Immigration |
---|
18 | 24 | | and Customs Enforcement; |
---|
19 | 25 | | (4) Special Agents of the Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, |
---|
20 | 26 | | Firearms and Explosives; |
---|
21 | 27 | | (5) Special Agents of the United States Drug |
---|
22 | 28 | | Enforcement Administration; |
---|
23 | 29 | | (6) Inspectors of the United States Postal Inspection |
---|
24 | 30 | | Service; |
---|
25 | 31 | | (7) Special Agents of the Criminal Investigation |
---|
26 | 32 | | Division of the Internal Revenue Service; |
---|
27 | 33 | | (8) Civilian Special Agents of the United States Naval |
---|
28 | 34 | | Criminal Investigative Service; |
---|
29 | 35 | | (9) Marshals and Deputy Marshals of the United States |
---|
30 | 36 | | Marshals Service; |
---|
31 | 37 | | (10) Special Agents of the United States Department of |
---|
32 | 38 | | State, Bureau of Diplomatic Security; |
---|
33 | 39 | | (11) Special Agents of the Treasury Inspector General |
---|
34 | 40 | | for Tax Administration; |
---|
35 | 41 | | (12) Special Agents of the Office of Inspector General |
---|
36 | 42 | | of the United States Social Security Administration; |
---|
37 | 43 | | (13) Special Agents of the Office of Inspector General |
---|
38 | 44 | | of the United States Department of Veterans Affairs; |
---|
39 | 45 | | (14) Special Agents of the Office of Inspector General |
---|
40 | 46 | | of the United States Department of Agriculture; [and] |
---|
41 | 47 | | (15) Special Agents of the Office of Export |
---|
42 | 48 | | Enforcement of the United States Department of Commerce; |
---|
43 | 49 | | (16) Special Agents of the Criminal Investigation |
---|
48 | 52 | | Law Enforcement of the United States Department of Veterans |
---|
49 | 53 | | Affairs. |
---|
50 | 54 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
51 | 55 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
52 | 56 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
53 | 57 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
54 | 58 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
55 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
56 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
57 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3452 was passed by the House on April |
---|
58 | | - | 30, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 116, Nays 25, 2 present, not |
---|
59 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
60 | | - | No. 3452 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 131, Nays 15, |
---|
61 | | - | 1 present, not voting. |
---|
62 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
63 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
64 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3452 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
65 | | - | amendments, on May 25, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
66 | | - | 0. |
---|
67 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
68 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
69 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
70 | | - | Date |
---|
71 | | - | __________________ |
---|
72 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 59 | + | * * * * * |
---|