Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3456 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/24/2021

                    By: White (Senate Sponsor - Eckhardt) H.B. No. 3456
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 12, 2021;
 May 14, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 24, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 24, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to inclusion of funds received by certain educational
 institutions or programs in foundation school program funds for
 purposes of certain budget reductions.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 19.007, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (h) to read as follows:
 (h)  Notwithstanding any other law, for purposes of any
 budget reductions requested by the Legislative Budget Board or the
 governor, any money received by the district or appropriated to the
 department for purposes of operating the district is considered to
 be part of the foundation school program and is not subject to those
 budget reductions.
 SECTION 2.  Section 29.259, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (j-1) to read as follows:
 (j-1)  Notwithstanding any other law, for purposes of any
 budget reductions requested by the Legislative Budget Board or the
 governor, any money received by a nonprofit entity granted a
 charter under this section or appropriated to the agency for
 purposes of operating an adult education program under this section
 is considered to be part of the foundation school program and is not
 subject to those budget reductions.
 SECTION 3.  Section 30.025, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 30.025.  FUNDING OF TEXAS SCHOOL FOR THE BLIND AND
 VISUALLY IMPAIRED. (a) The funding of the Texas School for the Blind
 and Visually Impaired consists of:
 (1)  money the legislature specifically appropriates
 to the school;
 (2)  money the agency allocates to the school under
 this code;
 (3)  money paid under a contract or other agreement;
 (4)  money the school receives through a gift or
 bequest;
 (5)  a payment the school receives from a school
 district under Section 30.003; and
 (6)  the school's share of the available school fund and
 payments to compensate for payments no longer made from the
 available school fund as provided by Section 30.003(f).
 (b)  Notwithstanding any other law, for purposes of any
 budget reductions requested by the Legislative Budget Board or the
 governor, any money received by the Texas School for the Blind and
 Visually Impaired or appropriated to the agency for purposes of
 operating the school is considered to be part of the foundation
 school program and is not subject to those budget reductions.
 SECTION 4.  Section 30.056, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 30.056.  FUNDING OF THE TEXAS SCHOOL FOR THE DEAF. (a)
 The funding of the Texas School for the Deaf consists of:
 (1)  money the legislature specifically appropriates
 for the school;
 (2)  money the agency allocates to the school under
 this code;
 (3)  money paid under a contract or other agreement;
 (4)  money the school receives through a gift or
 bequest;
 (5)  a payment the school receives from a school
 district under Section 30.003; and
 (6)  the school's share of the available school fund and
 payments to compensate for payments no longer made from the
 available school fund as provided by Section 30.003(f).
 (b)  Notwithstanding any other law, for purposes of any
 budget reductions requested by the Legislative Budget Board or the
 governor, any money received by the Texas School for the Deaf or
 appropriated to the agency for purposes of operating the school is
 considered to be part of the foundation school program and is not
 subject to those budget reductions.
 SECTION 5.  Section 37.012, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (f) to read as follows:
 (f)  Notwithstanding any other law, for purposes of any
 budget reductions requested by the Legislative Budget Board or the
 governor, any money received by a local juvenile probation
 department or appropriated to the Texas Juvenile Justice Department
 for purposes of operating a juvenile justice alternative education
 program is considered to be part of the foundation school program
 and is not subject to those budget reductions.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *