Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3469 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 10, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 20, 2021
Fiscal Note April 13, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 20, 2021
Analysis April 30, 2021