1 | | - | H.B. No. 3476 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Schofield H.B. No. 3476 |
---|
| 2 | + | (Senate Sponsor - Bettencourt, Campbell) |
---|
| 3 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2021; |
---|
| 4 | + | May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Water, |
---|
| 5 | + | Agriculture & Rural Affairs; May 20, 2021, reported adversely, |
---|
| 6 | + | with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, |
---|
| 7 | + | Nays 1; May 20, 2021, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 8 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 9 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3476 By: Perry |
---|
4 | 13 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 14 | | relating to certificates of public convenience and necessity issued |
---|
6 | 15 | | to water utilities inside the boundaries or extraterritorial |
---|
7 | 16 | | jurisdiction of certain municipalities. |
---|
8 | 17 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 18 | | SECTION 1. Section 13.245, Water Code, is amended by |
---|
10 | 19 | | amending Subsections (b), (c-3), (c-4), and (c-5) and adding |
---|
11 | 20 | | Subsection (c-6) to read as follows: |
---|
12 | 21 | | (b) Except as provided by Subsections (c), (c-1), and (c-2), |
---|
13 | 22 | | the utility commission may not grant to a retail public utility a |
---|
14 | 23 | | certificate of public convenience and necessity for a service area |
---|
15 | 24 | | within the boundaries or extraterritorial jurisdiction of a |
---|
16 | 25 | | municipality without the consent of the municipality. The |
---|
17 | 26 | | municipality may not unreasonably withhold the consent. [As a |
---|
18 | 27 | | condition of the consent, a municipality may require that all water |
---|
19 | 28 | | and sewer facilities be designed and constructed in accordance with |
---|
20 | 29 | | the municipality's standards for facilities.] |
---|
21 | 30 | | (c-3) The utility commission must include, as a condition of |
---|
22 | 31 | | a certificate of public convenience and necessity granted under |
---|
23 | 32 | | Subsection (c-1) or (c-2) for a service area within the boundaries |
---|
24 | 33 | | of a municipality, that all water and sewer facilities be designed |
---|
25 | 34 | | and constructed in accordance with the municipality's standards for |
---|
26 | 35 | | water and sewer facilities. |
---|
27 | 36 | | (c-4) The utility commission must include, as a condition of |
---|
28 | 37 | | a certificate of public convenience and necessity granted under |
---|
29 | 38 | | this section for a service area within the extraterritorial |
---|
30 | 39 | | jurisdiction of a municipality, that all water and sewer facilities |
---|
31 | 40 | | be designed and constructed in accordance with: |
---|
32 | 41 | | (1) the commission's standards for water and sewer |
---|
33 | 42 | | facilities applicable to water systems that serve greater than 250 |
---|
34 | 43 | | connections; or |
---|
35 | 44 | | (2) the commission's standards for water and sewer |
---|
36 | 45 | | facilities applicable to water systems that serve 250 or fewer |
---|
37 | 46 | | connections, if the utility commission determines that: |
---|
38 | 47 | | (A) standards for water and sewer facilities |
---|
39 | 48 | | applicable to water systems that serve 250 or fewer connections are |
---|
40 | 49 | | appropriate for the service area; and |
---|
41 | 50 | | (B) regionalization of the retail public utility |
---|
42 | 51 | | or consolidation of the retail public utility with another retail |
---|
43 | 52 | | public utility is not economically feasible under Section |
---|
44 | 53 | | 13.241(d). |
---|
45 | 54 | | (c-5) Subsections (c-1), (c-2), [and] (c-3), and (c-4) do |
---|
46 | 55 | | not apply to: |
---|
47 | 56 | | (1) a county that borders the United Mexican States |
---|
48 | 57 | | and the Gulf of Mexico or a county adjacent to such a county; |
---|
49 | 58 | | (2) a county with a population of more than 30,000 and |
---|
50 | 59 | | less than 35,000 that borders the Red River; or |
---|
51 | 60 | | (3) a county with a population of more than 100,000 and |
---|
52 | 61 | | less than 200,000 that borders a county described by Subdivision |
---|
53 | 62 | | (2). |
---|
54 | 63 | | (c-6) [(c-5)] Subsections (c-1), (c-2), [and] (c-3), and |
---|
55 | 64 | | (c-4) do not apply to: |
---|
56 | 65 | | (1) a county with a population of 130,000 or more that |
---|
57 | 66 | | is adjacent to a county with a population of 1.5 million or more |
---|
58 | 67 | | that is within 200 miles of an international border; or |
---|
59 | 68 | | (2) a county with a population of more than 40,000 and |
---|
60 | 69 | | less than 50,000 that contains a portion of the San Antonio River. |
---|
61 | 70 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
62 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
63 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
64 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3476 was passed by the House on April |
---|
65 | | - | 29, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 142, Nays 4, 1 present, not |
---|
66 | | - | voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to |
---|
67 | | - | H.B. No. 3476 on May 28, 2021, and requested the appointment of a |
---|
68 | | - | conference committee to consider the differences between the two |
---|
69 | | - | houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report |
---|
70 | | - | on H.B. No. 3476 on May 30, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 144, |
---|
71 | | - | Nays 0, 1 present, not voting. |
---|
72 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
73 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
74 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3476 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
75 | | - | amendments, on May 21, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays |
---|
76 | | - | 2; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference |
---|
77 | | - | committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and |
---|
78 | | - | that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No. |
---|
79 | | - | 3476 on May 29, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 2. |
---|
80 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
81 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
82 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
83 | | - | Date |
---|
84 | | - | __________________ |
---|
85 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 71 | + | * * * * * |
---|