Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB349 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 9, 2020

Engrossed

Bill May 8, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 13, 2021
Fiscal Note April 10, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 21, 2021