Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3496 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 10, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 21, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 14, 2021
Fiscal Note April 9, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 13, 2021
Analysis April 26, 2021