Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3504 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 10, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 11, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 4, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 4, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 3, 2021
Fiscal Note April 23, 2021