Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3507 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 10, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 22, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 21, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 13, 2021
Fiscal Note April 7, 2021