Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3514 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 10, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 8, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 21, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2021
Bill April 27, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 13, 2021
Analysis April 26, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 12, 2021
Fiscal Note April 15, 2021
Fiscal Note April 6, 2021