Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3533 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 10, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 14, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 23, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2021
Bill May 7, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 17, 2021
Fiscal Note May 5, 2021
Fiscal Note April 26, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 17, 2021
Analysis May 7, 2021