Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3564 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/21/2021

                    By: Paul (Senate Sponsor - Taylor) H.B. No. 3564
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2021;
 May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
 Commerce; May 19, 2021, rereferred to Committee on Jurisprudence;
 May 21, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 5,
 Nays 0; May 21, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of the Texas Department of Insurance to
 rescind a certificate of compliance issued for an improvement for
 purposes of coverage through the Texas Windstorm Insurance
 Association.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2210.2515(k), Insurance Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (k)  The department may not rescind a certificate of
 compliance after issuing the certificate [issued] under this
 section [if the department finds that the improvement does not
 comply with the applicable building code under the plan of
 operation].  [The commissioner may adopt rules as necessary to
 implement this subsection.]
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies to a
 certificate of compliance that is in effect or issued on or after
 the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *