1 | | - | H.B. No. 3564 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Paul (Senate Sponsor - Taylor) H.B. No. 3564 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2021; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Business & |
---|
| 4 | + | Commerce; May 19, 2021, rereferred to Committee on Jurisprudence; |
---|
| 5 | + | May 21, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 5, |
---|
| 6 | + | Nays 0; May 21, 2021, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
4 | 11 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 12 | | relating to the authority of the Texas Department of Insurance to |
---|
6 | 13 | | rescind a certificate of compliance issued for an improvement for |
---|
7 | 14 | | purposes of coverage through the Texas Windstorm Insurance |
---|
8 | 15 | | Association. |
---|
9 | 16 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
10 | 17 | | SECTION 1. Section 2210.2515(k), Insurance Code, is amended |
---|
11 | 18 | | to read as follows: |
---|
12 | 19 | | (k) The department may not rescind a certificate of |
---|
13 | 20 | | compliance after issuing the certificate [issued] under this |
---|
14 | 21 | | section [if the department finds that the improvement does not |
---|
15 | 22 | | comply with the applicable building code under the plan of |
---|
16 | 23 | | operation]. [The commissioner may adopt rules as necessary to |
---|
17 | 24 | | implement this subsection.] |
---|
18 | 25 | | SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies to a |
---|
19 | 26 | | certificate of compliance that is in effect or issued on or after |
---|
20 | 27 | | the effective date of this Act. |
---|
21 | 28 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
22 | 29 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
23 | 30 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
24 | 31 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
25 | 32 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
26 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
27 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
28 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3564 was passed by the House on April |
---|
29 | | - | 30, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 138, Nays 3, 2 present, not |
---|
30 | | - | voting. |
---|
31 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
32 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
33 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3564 was passed by the Senate on May |
---|
34 | | - | 22, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 28, Nays 2. |
---|
35 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
36 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
37 | | - | APPROVED: _____________________ |
---|
38 | | - | Date |
---|
39 | | - | _____________________ |
---|
40 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 33 | + | * * * * * |
---|