Old | New | Differences | |
---|---|---|---|
1 | - | H.B. No. 3571 | |
1 | + | By: Bonnen, Dean, Thompson of Brazoria H.B. No. 3571 | |
2 | + | (Senate Sponsor - Springer) | |
3 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2021; | |
4 | + | May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Business & | |
5 | + | Commerce; May 21, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable | |
6 | + | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; | |
7 | + | May 21, 2021, sent to printer.) | |
8 | + | Click here to see the committee vote | |
9 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3571 By: Hancock | |
2 | 10 | ||
3 | 11 | ||
12 | + | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED | |
4 | 13 | AN ACT | |
5 | 14 | relating to the regulation of security measures by certain property | |
6 | 15 | owners' associations. | |
7 | 16 | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: | |
8 | 17 | SECTION 1. Chapter 202, Property Code, is amended by adding | |
9 | 18 | Section 202.023 to read as follows: | |
10 | 19 | Sec. 202.023. SECURITY MEASURES. (a) This section does not | |
11 | - | apply to: | |
12 | - | (1) a condominium as defined by Section 81.002 or | |
13 | - | 82.003; or | |
14 | - | (2) a master mixed-use property owners' association | |
15 | - | subject to Chapter 215. | |
20 | + | apply to a master mixed-use property owners' association subject to | |
21 | + | Chapter 215. | |
16 | 22 | (b) Except as provided by Subsection (c), a property owners' | |
17 | 23 | association may not adopt or enforce a restrictive covenant that | |
18 | 24 | prevents a property owner from building or installing security | |
19 | 25 | measures, including but not limited to a security camera, motion | |
20 | 26 | detector, or perimeter fence. | |
21 | 27 | (c) This section does not prohibit a property owners' | |
22 | - | association from: | |
23 | - | (1) prohibiting the installation of a security camera | |
24 | - | by a property owner in a place other than the property owner's | |
25 | - | private property; or | |
26 | - | (2) regulating the type of fencing that a property | |
28 | + | association from regulating the type of fencing that a property | |
27 | 29 | owner may install. | |
28 | 30 | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives | |
29 | 31 | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as | |
30 | 32 | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this | |
31 | 33 | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this | |
32 | 34 | Act takes effect September 1, 2021. | |
33 | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ | |
34 | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House | |
35 | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3571 was passed by the House on April | |
36 | - | 30, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 139, Nays 2, 2 present, not | |
37 | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. | |
38 | - | No. 3571 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, | |
39 | - | 2 present, not voting. | |
40 | - | ______________________________ | |
41 | - | Chief Clerk of the House | |
42 | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3571 was passed by the Senate, with | |
43 | - | amendments, on May 24, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 28, Nays | |
44 | - | 2. | |
45 | - | ______________________________ | |
46 | - | Secretary of the Senate | |
47 | - | APPROVED: __________________ | |
48 | - | Date | |
49 | - | __________________ | |
50 | - | Governor | |
35 | + | * * * * * |