Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB359 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 12, 2020

Engrossed

Bill May 7, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 1, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 30, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 12, 2021