Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3606 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/20/2021

                    By: Leach, Rodriguez, Guillen H.B. No. 3606
 (Senate Sponsor - Bettencourt)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2021;
 May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 20, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 20, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the provision of vocational training to inmates
 confined in a Texas Department of Criminal Justice transfer
 facility.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter G, Chapter 499, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 499.156 to read as follows:
 Sec. 499.156.  VOCATIONAL TRAINING. The department shall
 adopt a policy under which a representative of a public or private
 entity, including a public or private institution of higher
 education, may provide vocational training on a voluntary basis to
 inmates confined in a transfer facility authorized under this
 subchapter.
 SECTION 2.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the Texas Department of Criminal Justice shall adopt
 the policy required by Section 499.156, Government Code, as added
 by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *