Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3610 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 3610
1+By: Gervin-Hawkins, Middleton, Sanford H.B. No. 3610
2+ (Senate Sponsor - Springer)
3+ (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2021;
4+ May 14, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
5+ May 21, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 12,
6+ Nays 0; May 21, 2021, sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
28
39
10+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
411 AN ACT
512 relating to the applicability of certain laws to certain public
613 schools and certain requirements of a charter school that receives
714 certain tax exemptions.
815 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
916 SECTION 1. Section 12.1058(a), Education Code, is amended
1017 to read as follows:
1118 (a) An open-enrollment charter school is considered to be:
1219 (1) a local government for purposes of Chapter 791,
1320 Government Code;
1421 (2) a local government for purposes of Chapter 2259,
1522 Government Code, except that an open-enrollment charter school may
1623 not issue public securities as provided by Section 2259.031(b),
1724 Government Code;
1825 (3) a political subdivision for purposes of Chapter
1926 172, Local Government Code; [and]
2027 (4) a local governmental entity for purposes of
2128 Subchapter I, Chapter 271, Local Government Code;
2229 (5) a political subdivision for purposes of Section
2330 16.061, Civil Practice and Remedies Code, with respect to any
2431 property purchased, leased, constructed, renovated, or improved
2532 with state funds under Section 12.128 of this code; and
2633 (6) a political subdivision for purposes of Section
2734 11.11, Tax Code.
2835 SECTION 2. Sections 12.128(a) and (a-1), Education Code,
2936 are amended to read as follows:
3037 (a) Property purchased with funds received by a charter
3138 holder under Section 12.106 [after September 1, 2001]:
3239 (1) is considered to be public property for all
3340 purposes under state law;
3441 (2) is property of this state held in trust by the
3542 charter holder for the benefit of the students of the
3643 open-enrollment charter school; [and]
3744 (3) may be used only for a purpose for which a school
3845 district may use school district property; and
3946 (4) is exempt from ad valorem taxation as provided by
4047 Section 11.11, Tax Code.
4148 (a-1) Property leased with funds received by a charter
4249 holder under Section 12.106 [after September 1, 2001]:
4350 (1) is considered to be public property for all
4451 purposes under state law;
4552 (2) is property of this state held in trust by the
4653 charter holder for the benefit of the students of the
4754 open-enrollment charter school; [and]
4855 (3) may be used only for a purpose for which a school
4956 district may use school district property; and
5057 (4) is exempt from ad valorem taxation as provided by
5158 Section 11.11, Tax Code.
5259 SECTION 3. Section 12.128, Education Code, is amended by
5360 adding Subsection (a-2) to read as follows:
5461 (a-2) The owner of property that receives a tax exemption
5562 under Subsection (a) shall transfer the amount of tax savings from
5663 the exemption to the tenant or reduce the common area maintenance
5764 fee in a proportionate amount based upon the square footage of the
5865 exempt portion of the property.
5966 SECTION 4. Subchapter B, Chapter 11, Tax Code, is amended by
6067 adding Section 11.211 to read as follows:
6168 Sec. 11.211. REAL PROPERTY LEASED TO CERTAIN SCHOOLS. The
6269 portion of real property that is leased to an independent school
6370 district, community college district, or open-enrollment charter
6471 school authorized by Subchapter C, D, or E, Chapter 12, Education
6572 Code, is qualified and exempt from taxation pursuant to Sections
6673 11.11 and 11.21 of this code if the portion of the real property
6774 that is leased to the public school is:
6875 (1) used exclusively by the public school for the
6976 operation or administration of the school or the performance of
7077 other educational functions of the school; and
7178 (2) reasonably necessary for a purpose described in
7279 Subdivision (1) as found by the school's governing body.
7380 SECTION 5. The change in law made by this Act applies only
7481 to ad valorem taxes imposed in a tax year that begins on or after the
7582 effective date of this Act.
7683 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
77- ______________________________ ______________________________
78- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
79- I certify that H.B. No. 3610 was passed by the House on May 8,
80- 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 65, Nays 60, 2 present, not
81- voting.
82- ______________________________
83- Chief Clerk of the House
84- I certify that H.B. No. 3610 was passed by the Senate on May
85- 22, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 19, Nays 11.
86- ______________________________
87- Secretary of the Senate
88- APPROVED: _____________________
89- Date
90- _____________________
91- Governor
84+ * * * * *