Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3615 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 17, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 6, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 13, 2021
Bill April 13, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 13, 2021
Fiscal Note April 12, 2021
Fiscal Note March 31, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 12, 2021
Analysis April 12, 2021