Senate | 05/10/2021 | Referred to Business & Commerce | ||
Senate | 05/10/2021 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 05/03/2021 | Received from the House | ||
House | 04/30/2021 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 04/30/2021 | Record vote RV#582 | ||
House | 04/30/2021 | Passed | ||
House | 04/30/2021 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 04/30/2021 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 04/30/2021 | Passed to engrossment | ||
House | 04/30/2021 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 04/30/2021 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/27/2021 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/09/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/07/2021 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/07/2021 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/07/2021 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2021 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/07/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | ||
House | 03/10/2021 | Filed |