Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3643 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/30/2021

                            H.B. No. 3643


 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of the Texas Commission on Virtual
 Education.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 48, Education Code, is amended by adding
 Subchapter I to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER I. TEXAS COMMISSION ON VIRTUAL EDUCATION
 Sec. 48.401.  DEFINITION. In this subchapter, "commission"
 means the Texas Commission on Virtual Education.
 Sec. 48.402.  TEXAS COMMISSION ON VIRTUAL EDUCATION. (a)
 The commission is established to develop and make recommendations
 regarding the delivery of virtual education in the public school
 system and state funding for virtual education under the Foundation
 School Program.
 (b)  The commission consists of 13 members appointed as
 follows:
 (1)  four members appointed by the governor;
 (2)  four members appointed by the lieutenant governor;
 (3)  four members appointed by the speaker of the house
 of representatives; and
 (4)  a member of the State Board of Education, as
 designated by the chair of that board.
 (c)  The members appointed by the governor must have an
 interest in public education and include at least:
 (1)  one current or retired classroom teacher with at
 least 10 years of teaching experience;
 (2)  one member of the business community; and
 (3)  one member of the civic community.
 (d)  The appointments made by the lieutenant governor and the
 speaker of the house of representatives must each consist of:
 (1)  three members of the applicable legislative
 chamber; and
 (2)  an administrator in the public school system or an
 elected member of the board of trustees of a school district.
 (e)  In making appointments under Subsections (b)(1), (2),
 and (3), the governor, lieutenant governor, and speaker of the
 house of representatives shall coordinate to ensure that the
 membership of the commission reflects, to the extent possible, the
 ethnic and geographic diversity of this state.
 Sec. 48.403.  PRESIDING OFFICER. The governor shall
 designate the presiding officer of the commission.
 Sec. 48.404.  COMPENSATION AND REIMBURSEMENT. A member of
 the commission is not entitled to compensation for service on the
 commission but is entitled to reimbursement for actual and
 necessary expenses incurred in performing commission duties.
 Sec. 48.405.  ADMINISTRATIVE SUPPORT AND FUNDING. (a)  The
 agency shall provide administrative support for the commission.
 (b)  Funding for the administrative and operational expenses
 of the commission shall be provided by legislative appropriation
 made to the agency for that purpose.
 Sec. 48.406.  RECOMMENDATIONS. (a) The commission shall
 develop recommendations to address issues related to the delivery
 of and funding for virtual education, including alternative
 instructional delivery methods and alternative methods of funding.
 (b)  The commission may establish one or more working groups
 composed of not more than five members of the commission to study,
 discuss, and address specific policy issues and recommendations to
 refer to the commission for consideration.
 Sec. 48.407.  REPORT. Not later than December 31, 2022, the
 commission shall prepare and deliver a report to the governor and
 the legislature that contains commission recommendations for
 legislative action to improve the implementation of virtual
 education.
 Sec. 48.408.  PUBLIC MEETINGS AND PUBLIC INFORMATION. (a)
 The commission may hold public meetings as needed to fulfill its
 duties under this subchapter.
 (b)  The commission is subject to Chapters 551 and 552,
 Government Code.
 Sec. 48.4085.  GIFTS, GRANTS, AND DONATIONS. The agency may
 accept gifts, grants, and donations from any source to support the
 commission.
 Sec. 48.409.  COMMISSION ABOLISHED; EXPIRATION OF
 SUBCHAPTER. The commission is abolished and this subchapter expires
 January 1, 2023.
 SECTION 2.  The Texas Commission on Virtual Education, as
 created by Subchapter I, Chapter 48, Education Code, as added by
 this Act, is required to implement a provision of this Act only if
 the legislature appropriates money specifically for that purpose.
 If the legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that
 purpose, the agency may, but is not required to, support the
 commission using other appropriations available for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act applies beginning with the 2021-2022
 school year.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3643 was passed by the House on April
 29, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 103, Nays 41, 1 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 3643 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 106, Nays 40,
 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3643 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 24, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 29, Nays
 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor