Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3644 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 10, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 23, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 10, 2021
Bill April 14, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 5, 2021
Fiscal Note April 9, 2021
Fiscal Note March 28, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 4, 2021
Analysis April 13, 2021