Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3665 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/20/2021

                    By: Ordaz Perez, Morales Shaw H.B. No. 3665
 (Senate Sponsor - Blanco)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2021;
 May 14, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 20, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 20, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3665 By:  Blanco


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to expanding the definition of bicycle to include devices
 with more than two wheels, including to accommodate modifications
 necessary for adaptive riding by persons with disabilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 541.201(2), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (2)  "Bicycle" means a device, excluding a moped, that
 [a person may ride and that:
 [(A)]  is capable of being ridden solely using
 human power[;] and has either:
 (A) [(B)  has] two tandem wheels at least one of
 which is more than 14 inches in diameter;
 (B)  three wheels, two of which are in parallel,
 and at least one of the three wheels is more than 14 inches in
 diameter; or
 (C)  any number of wheels and adaptive technology
 that allows the device to be ridden by a person with a disability.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *