1 | | - | H.B. No. 3665 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Ordaz Perez, Morales Shaw H.B. No. 3665 |
---|
| 2 | + | (Senate Sponsor - Blanco) |
---|
| 3 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2021; |
---|
| 4 | + | May 14, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
| 5 | + | Transportation; May 20, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
| 6 | + | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; |
---|
| 7 | + | May 20, 2021, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 8 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 9 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3665 By: Blanco |
---|
4 | 13 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 14 | | relating to expanding the definition of bicycle to include devices |
---|
6 | 15 | | with more than two wheels, including to accommodate modifications |
---|
7 | 16 | | necessary for adaptive riding by persons with disabilities. |
---|
8 | 17 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 18 | | SECTION 1. Section 541.201(2), Transportation Code, is |
---|
10 | 19 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 20 | | (2) "Bicycle" means a device, excluding a moped, that |
---|
12 | 21 | | [a person may ride and that: |
---|
13 | 22 | | [(A)] is capable of being ridden solely using |
---|
14 | 23 | | human power[;] and has either: |
---|
15 | 24 | | (A) [(B) has] two tandem wheels at least one of |
---|
16 | 25 | | which is more than 14 inches in diameter; |
---|
17 | 26 | | (B) three wheels, two of which are in parallel, |
---|
18 | 27 | | and at least one of the three wheels is more than 14 inches in |
---|
19 | 28 | | diameter; or |
---|
20 | 29 | | (C) any number of wheels and adaptive technology |
---|
21 | 30 | | that allows the device to be ridden by a person with a disability. |
---|
22 | 31 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
23 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
24 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
25 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3665 was passed by the House on April |
---|
26 | | - | 30, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 119, Nays 22, 2 present, not |
---|
27 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
28 | | - | No. 3665 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 124, Nays 22, |
---|
29 | | - | 1 present, not voting. |
---|
30 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
31 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
32 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3665 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
33 | | - | amendments, on May 27, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
34 | | - | 0. |
---|
35 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
36 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
37 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
38 | | - | Date |
---|
39 | | - | __________________ |
---|
40 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 32 | + | * * * * * |
---|