1 | 1 | | 87R8942 SMT-D |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: Bonnen H.B. No. 3684 |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
6 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
7 | 7 | | relating to the continuation of the windstorm insurance legislative |
---|
8 | 8 | | funding and funding structure oversight board and to studies |
---|
9 | 9 | | relating to the Texas Windstorm Insurance Association and the Fair |
---|
10 | 10 | | Access to Insurance Requirements Plan. |
---|
11 | 11 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
12 | 12 | | SECTION 1. Section 2210.664(b), Insurance Code, is amended |
---|
13 | 13 | | to read as follows: |
---|
14 | 14 | | (b) Not later than November 15, 2022 [2020], the board shall |
---|
15 | 15 | | deliver a [the] report prepared under Subsection (a) to: |
---|
16 | 16 | | (1) the governor; |
---|
17 | 17 | | (2) the lieutenant governor; and |
---|
18 | 18 | | (3) the speaker of the house of representatives. |
---|
19 | 19 | | SECTION 2. Section 2210.665, Insurance Code, is amended to |
---|
20 | 20 | | read as follows: |
---|
21 | 21 | | Sec. 2210.665. EXPIRATION. This subchapter expires |
---|
22 | 22 | | September 1, 2023 [2021]. |
---|
23 | 23 | | SECTION 3. Sections 14(c) and (d), Chapter 790 (H.B. 1900), |
---|
24 | 24 | | Acts of the 86th Legislature, Regular Session, 2019, are amended to |
---|
25 | 25 | | read as follows: |
---|
26 | 26 | | (c) Not later than January 1, 2023 [2021], the windstorm |
---|
27 | 27 | | insurance legislative oversight board shall submit to the governor, |
---|
28 | 28 | | the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of |
---|
29 | 29 | | representatives, and the Texas Department of Insurance a written |
---|
30 | 30 | | report of a [the] study conducted under this section. The report |
---|
31 | 31 | | must include the findings and legislative recommendations of the |
---|
32 | 32 | | board. |
---|
33 | 33 | | (d) This section expires January 1, 2024 [2022]. |
---|
34 | 34 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|