Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3689 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 10, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 19, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 13, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 12, 2021
Fiscal Note April 5, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 12, 2021
Analysis April 13, 2021