Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3691 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 10, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 14, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2021
Bill April 24, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 21, 2021
Analysis April 23, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 20, 2021
Fiscal Note April 20, 2021
Fiscal Note April 5, 2021