Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB372 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 9, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 16, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 5, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 1, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 7, 2021