Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3730 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/11/2021

                            87R10698 EAS-D
 By: Howard H.B. No. 3730


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of a task force to study workforce
 shortages and care practices in assisted living facilities and
 nursing facilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Assisted living facility" means a facility
 licensed under Chapter 247, Health and Safety Code.
 (2)  "Commission" means the Health and Human Services
 Commission.
 (3)  "Executive commissioner" means the executive
 commissioner of the commission.
 (4)  "Nursing facility" means a facility licensed under
 Chapter 242, Health and Safety Code.
 (5)  "Task force" means the task force on workforce
 shortages and care practices in assisted living facilities and
 nursing facilities established under this section.
 (b)  The task force on workforce shortages and care practices
 in assisted living facilities and nursing facilities is established
 to:
 (1)  evaluate the workforce shortages in assisted
 living facilities and nursing facilities in this state;
 (2)  evaluate direct care staffing issues in assisted
 living facilities and nursing facilities in this state;
 (3)  develop recommendations for legislation,
 policies, short-term strategies, and long-term strategies focusing
 on retention and recruitment of direct care staff in assisted
 living facilities and nursing facilities to ensure an adequate
 workforce is available to provide high-quality, cost-effective
 care, including recommendations on:
 (A)  workforce engagement and advancement models;
 (B)  job supports and incentives;
 (C)  training and education initiatives;
 (D)  wages and benefits; and
 (E)  licensure and certification rules; and
 (4)  examine nursing facility reform, including:
 (A)  implementing new care models;
 (B)  optimizing nursing facility size and
 configuration to foster resident wellness and infection control;
 (C)  optimizing nursing facility staffing to meet
 resident needs; and
 (D)  increasing clinical presence in nursing
 facilities.
 (c)  The task force is composed of:
 (1)  one member appointed by the governor;
 (2)  the state long-term care ombudsman; and
 (3)  not more than 11 members appointed by the
 executive commissioner as follows:
 (A)  at least one member who is a representative
 of the commission;
 (B)  at least one member who represents LeadingAge
 Texas;
 (C)  at least one member who represents the Texas
 Health Care Association;
 (D)  at least one member who represents the Texas
 Assisted Living Association;
 (E)  at least one member who represents the
 American Association of Retired Persons;
 (F)  at least one member who represents the Texas
 Higher Education Coordinating Board;
 (G)  at least one member who represents the Texas
 Medical Directors Association;
 (H)  at least one member who represents the Texas
 Workforce Commission; and
 (I)  two or more members who represent a public or
 private institution of higher education in this state.
 (d)  Not later than November 1, 2021, the governor and the
 executive commissioner shall appoint task force members as required
 by Subsection (c) of this section.
 (e)  Not later than November 1, 2022, the task force shall
 prepare and submit to the legislature, the commission, the Senate
 Health and Human Services Committee, and the House Public Health
 Committee a written report containing the results of the task
 force's evaluation under Subsection (b) of this section and any
 recommendations for legislative or other action.
 (f)  The commission shall post the report submitted to the
 commission under Subsection (e) of this section on the commission's
 Internet website.
 (g)  The task force is abolished and this Act expires
 September 1, 2023.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.