House
|
05/10/2021
|
Record vote RV#915
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
Failed to pass
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2021
|
1 hr. notice-for reconsideration
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2021
|
Record vote RV#906
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2021
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Amended 2-K. Bell, VanDeaver, K. King, Buckley, Huberty, Allison, and Geren
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Amended 1-Dutton
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2021
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2021
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2021
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2021
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2021
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2021
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|