Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3745 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 11, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 21, 2021
Bill April 20, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 21, 2021
Analysis May 15, 2021
Analysis April 19, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 20, 2021
Fiscal Note May 15, 2021
Fiscal Note April 15, 2021
Fiscal Note April 12, 2021