Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3749 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/11/2021

                            87R13155 CXP-D
 By: Lucio III H.B. No. 3749


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the provision of electric service during extreme
 weather conditions.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 35, Utilities Code, is
 amended by adding Section 35.0021 to read as follows:
 Sec. 35.0021.  EXTREME WEATHER PREPAREDNESS. The commission
 shall conduct regular inspections of facilities and equipment used
 by providers of generation in the ERCOT power region to ensure
 adequate weatherization preparedness for extreme weather
 conditions.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter Z, Chapter 39, Utilities Code, is
 amended by adding Section 39.918 to read as follows:
 Sec. 39.918.  PUBLICATION OF ENERGY EMERGENCY ALERTS. If an
 independent organization certified under Section 39.151 for the
 ERCOT power region declares an energy emergency alert, the
 commission shall publish a notification regarding the alert on the
 home page of the commission's Internet website as soon as
 practicable.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter A, Chapter 186, Utilities Code, is
 amended by adding Section 186.008 to read as follows:
 Sec. 186.008.  EMERGENCY OPERATIONS PLAN AUDITS. (a)  The
 Public Utility Commission of Texas by rule shall develop a
 procedure for auditing emergency operations plans developed by:
 (1)  electric utilities, as defined by Section 31.002;
 (2)  power generation companies, as defined by Section
 31.002;
 (3)  municipally owned utilities, as defined by Section
 11.003;
 (4)  electric cooperatives;
 (5)  retail electric providers, as defined by Section
 31.002; and
 (6)  the independent organization certified under
 Section 39.151 for the ERCOT power region.
 (b)  The procedure for auditing emergency operations plans
 must require an entity described by Subsection (a) to file an
 updated emergency operations plan if the Public Utility Commission
 of Texas finds that the entity's emergency operations plan on file
 does not contain adequate information to determine whether the
 entity can provide adequate services during an emergency.
 SECTION 4.  (a) Not later than December 1, 2021, the governor
 shall appoint a task force to conduct a study of the actions of the
 Public Utility Commission of Texas, the independent organization
 certified under Section 39.151, Utilities Code, for the ERCOT power
 region, and electricity market participants taken during February
 2021 to respond to the extreme weather event of that month.
 (b)  A person must have expertise in electricity markets to
 be eligible for appointment to the task force.
 (c)  Not later than September 1, 2022, the task force shall
 submit a report of the findings of the study and any associated
 recommendations to the legislature.
 (d)  The task force is abolished and this section expires
 December 31, 2022.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.