House | 05/11/2021 | Withdrawn from calendar (contested) | ||
House | 05/11/2021 | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. | ||
House | 05/11/2021 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/07/2021 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/30/2021 | Withdrawn from calendar (by author) | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/09/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/09/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 03/31/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/31/2021 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/31/2021 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Referred to Transportation | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Read first time | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Filed |