Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3769 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 3769
1+By: Smithee (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 3769
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House April 26, 2021;
3+ May 4, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
4+ Commerce; May 13, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:
5+ Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 13, 2021, sent to printer.)
6+Click here to see the committee vote
27
38
9+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
410 AN ACT
511 relating to required disclosures for certain occupational
612 insurance policies.
713 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
814 SECTION 1. Subtitle C, Title 5, Insurance Code, is amended
915 by adding Chapter 564 to read as follows:
1016 CHAPTER 564. DISCLOSURES FOR THE SALE OF CERTAIN OCCUPATIONAL
1117 INSURANCE POLICIES
1218 Sec. 564.001. SCOPE OF CHAPTER; PURPOSE. (a) This chapter
1319 is intended to require disclosures on policy forms for certain
1420 occupational insurance policies designed or marketed to provide
1521 coverage to an employer that elects not to maintain workers'
1622 compensation insurance coverage under Chapter 406, Labor Code.
1723 (b) Nothing in this chapter prohibits an employer that is
1824 not required to maintain workers' compensation insurance coverage
1925 and has elected not to obtain workers' compensation insurance
2026 coverage from obtaining occupational accident, disease, or death
2127 insurance coverage for the employer or the employer's employees.
2228 Sec. 564.002. APPLICABILITY OF CHAPTER. This chapter
2329 applies to an insurance company authorized to write accident and
2430 health insurance or liability insurance, including:
2531 (1) a surplus lines insurer;
2632 (2) a Lloyd's plan; and
2733 (3) a reciprocal or interinsurance exchange.
2834 Sec. 564.003. EXCEPTIONS. This chapter does not apply to:
2935 (1) a plan that provides coverage:
3036 (A) only for a specified disease or another
3137 limited benefit;
3238 (B) only for dental or vision care; or
3339 (C) only for hospital indemnity for hospital
3440 confinement;
3541 (2) a Medicare supplemental policy as defined by
3642 Section 1882(g)(1), Social Security Act (42 U.S.C. Section
3743 1395ss);
3844 (3) long-term care coverage or benefits, home health
3945 care coverage or benefits, community-based care coverage or
4046 benefits, or any combination of those coverages or benefits;
4147 (4) an individual or group life insurance policy; or
4248 (5) individual or group credit life, accident, or
4349 disability insurance.
4450 Sec. 564.004. OCCUPATIONAL POLICY DEFINED. In this
4551 chapter, "occupational policy" means:
4652 (1) an individual or group accident or health
4753 insurance policy that explicitly provides coverage or benefits for
4854 an employer or the employer's employees for an employee's
4955 occupational bodily injury, disease, or death;
5056 (2) an employer's insurance policy that explicitly
5157 provides liability coverage to an employer that elects not to
5258 maintain workers' compensation insurance coverage under Chapter
5359 406, Labor Code, for an employee's occupational bodily injury,
5460 disease, or death in:
5561 (A) a general liability insurance policy;
5662 (B) a commercial multiple peril insurance
5763 policy; or
5864 (C) any other type of insurance policy designated
5965 by the department as intended to provide liability coverage to an
6066 employer that elects not to maintain workers' compensation
6167 insurance coverage under Chapter 406, Labor Code, for an employee's
6268 occupational bodily injury, disease, or death;
6369 (3) an accident, health, or liability insurance
6470 policy that does not expressly include coverage for occupational
6571 injuries, disease, or death, but is marketed or sold to or through
6672 an employer as an alternative to coverage for benefits or liability
6773 provided by a workers' compensation insurance policy; or
6874 (4) a policy that includes occupational accident and
6975 health and liability coverage in the same policy.
7076 Sec. 564.005. REQUIRED DISCLOSURES FOR OCCUPATIONAL
7177 POLICIES. An occupational policy shall include the following
7278 disclosure statement in 10-point boldface type on the first page of
7379 the policy and on the first page of all materials used in
7480 advertising or marketing the occupational policy to an employer
7581 that elects not to maintain workers' compensation insurance
7682 coverage under Chapter 406, Labor Code:
7783 "THIS IS NOT A WORKERS' COMPENSATION INSURANCE POLICY. THE
7884 EMPLOYER DOES NOT OBTAIN WORKERS' COMPENSATION INSURANCE COVERAGE
7985 BY PURCHASING THIS POLICY, AND IF THE EMPLOYER HAS NOT ELECTED TO
8086 OBTAIN WORKERS' COMPENSATION INSURANCE COVERAGE, THE EMPLOYER DOES
8187 NOT OBTAIN THOSE BENEFITS THAT WOULD OTHERWISE ACCRUE UNDER THE
8288 WORKERS' COMPENSATION LAWS IN THIS STATE. THE EMPLOYER MUST COMPLY
8389 WITH THE WORKERS' COMPENSATION LAWS IN THIS STATE AS THEY PERTAIN TO
8490 EMPLOYERS THAT ELECT NOT TO MAINTAIN WORKERS' COMPENSATION
8591 INSURANCE COVERAGE AND THE REQUIRED NOTIFICATIONS THAT MUST BE
8692 FILED AND POSTED."
8793 Sec. 564.006. RULES. The commissioner shall adopt rules as
8894 necessary to implement this chapter.
8995 SECTION 2. As soon as practicable after the effective date
9096 of this Act, the commissioner of insurance shall adopt rules to
9197 implement Chapter 564, Insurance Code, as added by this Act.
9298 SECTION 3. Chapter 564, Insurance Code, as added by this
9399 Act, applies only to an occupational insurance policy delivered,
94100 issued for delivery, or renewed on or after January 1, 2022. An
95101 occupational insurance policy delivered, issued for delivery, or
96102 renewed before January 1, 2022, is governed by the law as it existed
97103 immediately before the effective date of this Act, and that law is
98104 continued in effect for that purpose.
99105 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
100- ______________________________ ______________________________
101- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
102- I certify that H.B. No. 3769 was passed by the House on April
103- 23, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 143, Nays 3, 2 present, not
104- voting.
105- ______________________________
106- Chief Clerk of the House
107- I certify that H.B. No. 3769 was passed by the Senate on May
108- 19, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
109- ______________________________
110- Secretary of the Senate
111- APPROVED: _____________________
112- Date
113- _____________________
114- Governor
106+ * * * * *