Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3802 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 11, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 14, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 21, 2021
Bill May 8, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 20, 2021
Fiscal Note May 4, 2021
Fiscal Note April 17, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 20, 2021
Analysis May 7, 2021