Senate | 04/19/2021 | Referred to Business & Commerce | ||
Senate | 04/19/2021 | Received from the House | ||
Senate | 04/19/2021 | Read first time | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Record vote RV#234 | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Passed | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 04/14/2021 | Record vote RV#212 | ||
House | 04/14/2021 | Passed to engrossment | ||
House | 04/14/2021 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 04/14/2021 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/09/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/06/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/06/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/23/2021 | Referred to Insurance | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Filed |