Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3820 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 11, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 16, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 15, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 11, 2021
Fiscal Note March 29, 2021