1 | | - | H.B. No. 3821 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Hunter (Senate Sponsor - Menéndez) H.B. No. 3821 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2021; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 12, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Health & |
---|
| 4 | + | Human Services; May 21, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
| 5 | + | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; |
---|
| 6 | + | May 21, 2021, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3821 By: Perry |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to employing and training mental health professionals for |
---|
6 | 14 | | the mental health program for veterans. |
---|
7 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 16 | | SECTION 1. Sections 434.352(a) and (b), Government Code, |
---|
9 | 17 | | are amended to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 18 | | (a) The commission and the Health and Human [Department of |
---|
11 | 19 | | State Health] Services Commission shall coordinate to administer |
---|
12 | 20 | | the mental health program for veterans developed under Chapter |
---|
13 | 21 | | 1001, Health and Safety Code. |
---|
14 | 22 | | (b) For the mental health program for veterans, the |
---|
15 | 23 | | commission shall: |
---|
16 | 24 | | (1) provide training to peer service coordinators and |
---|
17 | 25 | | peers in accordance with Section 434.353; |
---|
18 | 26 | | (2) provide technical assistance to peer service |
---|
19 | 27 | | coordinators and peers; |
---|
20 | 28 | | (3) identify, train, and communicate with |
---|
21 | 29 | | community-based licensed mental health professionals, |
---|
22 | 30 | | community-based organizations, and faith-based organizations; |
---|
23 | 31 | | (4) coordinate services for justice involved |
---|
24 | 32 | | veterans; [and] |
---|
25 | 33 | | (5) coordinate local delivery to veterans and |
---|
26 | 34 | | immediate family members of veterans of mental health first aid for |
---|
27 | 35 | | veterans training; and |
---|
28 | 36 | | (6) employ and train mental health professionals to |
---|
29 | 37 | | assist the Health and Human Services Commission in the |
---|
30 | 38 | | administration of the program. |
---|
31 | 39 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
32 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
33 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
34 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3821 was passed by the House on May 8, |
---|
35 | | - | 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 125, Nays 14, 2 present, not |
---|
36 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
37 | | - | No. 3821 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, |
---|
38 | | - | 1 present, not voting. |
---|
39 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
40 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
41 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3821 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
42 | | - | amendments, on May 24, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays |
---|
43 | | - | 0. |
---|
44 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
45 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
46 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
47 | | - | Date |
---|
48 | | - | __________________ |
---|
49 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 40 | + | * * * * * |
---|