Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3849 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 17, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 23, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2021
Bill April 19, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 15, 2021
Analysis April 16, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 14, 2021
Fiscal Note April 17, 2021
Fiscal Note March 30, 2021