Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB385 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 9, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 30, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 29, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 26, 2021
Fiscal Note May 17, 2021
Fiscal Note April 20, 2021
Fiscal Note April 13, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2021
Bill April 24, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 17, 2021
Analysis April 23, 2021