Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3864 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/24/2021

                    By: Murr (Senate Sponsor - Powell) H.B. No. 3864
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2021;
 May 14, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 24, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 24, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to excused absences from public school for certain
 students to visit a professional's workplace for a career
 investigation day.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 25.087, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (b-8) and amending Subsection (d) to read as
 follows:
 (b-8)  A school district may excuse a student from attending
 school for a career investigation day to visit a professional at the
 professional's workplace during the student's junior and senior
 years of high school for the purpose of determining the student's
 interest in pursuing a career in the professional's field, provided
 that:
 (1)  the district may not excuse for this purpose more
 than two days during the student's junior year and two days during
 the student's senior year; and
 (2)  the district adopts:
 (A)  a policy to determine when an absence may be
 excused for this purpose; and
 (B)  a procedure to verify that the student's
 visit at the professional's workplace did occur.
 (d)  A student whose absence is excused under Subsection (b),
 (b-1), (b-2), (b-4), (b-5), (b-8), or (c) may not be penalized for
 that absence and shall be counted as if the student attended school
 for purposes of calculating the average daily attendance of
 students in the school district. A student whose absence is excused
 under Subsection (b), (b-1), (b-2), (b-4), (b-5), (b-8), or (c)
 shall be allowed a reasonable time to make up school work missed on
 those days. If the student satisfactorily completes the school
 work, the day of absence shall be counted as a day of compulsory
 attendance.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies beginning with the 2021-2022
 school year.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *