Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3878 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/11/2021

                            87R2349 SLB-F
 By: Hinojosa H.B. No. 3878


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to economic development and workforce retraining
 opportunities in the transition to the use of clean energy sources.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 403, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 403.0285 to read as follows:
 Sec. 403.0285.  COMMITTEE ON ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND
 WORKFORCE RETRAINING IN CLEAN ENERGY TRANSITION. (a) In this
 section, "committee" means the Committee on Economic Development
 and Workforce Retraining in the Clean Energy Transition.
 (b)  The governor shall appoint the Committee on Economic
 Development and Workforce Retraining in the Clean Energy Transition
 to assist the comptroller in identifying and evaluating economic
 development and workforce retraining opportunities with regard to
 the transition to clean energy sources.
 (c)  The committee is composed of not more than 21 members
 and shall include:
 (1)  representatives of environmental justice
 communities, environmental associations, and labor organizations;
 (2)  at least five representatives of industries that
 use large amounts of energy;
 (3)  representatives of the renewable energy industry,
 the oil and gas industry, including pipeline construction and
 operation and refineries, and clean energy developers; and
 (4)  at least one representative from each of the
 following agencies:
 (A)  the comptroller of public accounts;
 (B)  the office of the governor;
 (C)  the Railroad Commission of Texas;
 (D)  the State Energy Conservation Office;
 (E)  the Texas Commission on Environmental
 Quality;
 (F)  the Texas Department of Housing and Community
 Affairs; and
 (G)  the Texas Workforce Commission.
 (d)  The governor shall solicit nominations for the
 committee and select from among those nominated to the extent
 possible in order to meet the requirements of Subsection (c).
 (e)  The committee shall advise the comptroller by
 identifying:
 (1)  opportunities for workforce development and
 training related to energy efficiency measures, renewable energy,
 and other clean energy technologies, with specific focus on
 training and workforce opportunities for individuals from
 disadvantaged communities and other groups that may be
 underrepresented in the workforce, including veterans, women, and
 formerly incarcerated persons;
 (2)  industries that use large amounts of energy and
 trades related to those industries;
 (3)  impacts of the transition to the use of clean
 energy sources on each sector of the state's workforce and ways to
 maximize the skills and expertise of workers throughout the
 transition;
 (4)  sites of electric generating facilities that may
 be closed as a result of the transition to the use of clean energy
 sources and the issues and opportunities presented by reuse of
 those sites;
 (5)  potential effects of state or federal greenhouse
 gas emissions limits on state industries and local communities,
 including the impact of any potential carbon reduction measures on
 the competitiveness of state business and industry; and
 (6)  any other matters relevant to the workforce of the
 state with regard to the transition to the use of clean energy
 sources.
 (f)  The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality and the
 State Energy Conservation Office shall provide the committee with
 facilities, data, and other assistance necessary for the committee
 to carry out its duties under this section.  A state agency or
 political subdivision of this state shall provide the committee
 with facilities, data, and other assistance as requested by the
 committee to carry out its duties under this section.
 (g)  The committee may enter into an interagency agreement
 with the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality, the Public
 Utility Commission of Texas, the Railroad Commission of Texas, the
 Texas Workforce Commission, or another state agency for technical
 advice or assistance as necessary to complete the requirements of
 this section.
 SECTION 2.  (a)  Not later than December 1, 2022, the
 comptroller, with the advice of the Committee on Economic
 Development and Workforce Retraining in the Clean Energy
 Transition, shall prepare a report on the effects and opportunities
 of the transition to clean energy, including:
 (1)  issues and opportunities related to industries
 that use large amounts of energy and trades associated with those
 industries;
 (2)  clean energy workforce development for:
 (A)  workers in industries that may be negatively
 affected by the transition to the use of clean energy sources; and
 (B)  disadvantaged communities and other segments
 of the population that are underrepresented in the state's
 workforce;
 (3)  measures to minimize the loss of jobs and industry
 that would be associated with the imposition of any potential
 greenhouse gas emissions reduction policies or other energy sector
 mandates related to greenhouse gases;
 (4)  the number of jobs that have been created to
 counter climate change, including in the energy, building,
 transportation, and working lands sectors;
 (5)  the projection of the inventory of jobs needed and
 the skills and training required to meet the demand of jobs to
 counter climate change; and
 (6)  other issues related to workforce disruption due
 to community transitions from an economy based on fossil fuels.
 (b)  The comptroller shall make the report described by
 Subsection (a) of this section available to the public on the
 comptroller's Internet website and deliver the report to:
 (1)  the governor;
 (2)  the lieutenant governor;
 (3)  the speaker of the house of representatives; and
 (4)  the chair and vice chair of the:
 (A)  House Environmental Regulation Committee;
 (B)  House State Affairs Committee;
 (C)  Senate Natural Resources Committee; and
 (D)  Senate Business and Commerce Committee.
 (c)  This section expires September 1, 2023.
 SECTION 3.  Not later than December 1, 2021, the governor
 shall make the appointments to the Committee on Economic
 Development and Workforce Retraining in the Clean Energy Transition
 as required by Section 403.0285, Government Code, as added by this
 Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.