1 | | - | H.B. No. 3897 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Thompson of Harris (Senate Sponsor - Birdwell) H.B. No. 3897 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 12, 2021; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 12, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Business & |
---|
| 4 | + | Commerce; May 21, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
| 5 | + | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 1; |
---|
| 6 | + | May 21, 2021, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3897 By: Hancock |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to fees levied by municipalities and counties for certain |
---|
6 | 14 | | alcoholic beverage licenses. |
---|
7 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 16 | | SECTION 1. Section 61.36, Alcoholic Beverage Code, is |
---|
9 | 17 | | amended by adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 18 | | (a-1) The fee authorized by Subsection (a) for a brewer's |
---|
11 | 19 | | license or a brewer's self-distribution license may not exceed 50 |
---|
12 | 20 | | percent of the fee set by rule for the license. |
---|
13 | 21 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
14 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
15 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
16 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3897 was passed by the House on May |
---|
17 | | - | 11, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 138, Nays 5, 2 present, not |
---|
18 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
19 | | - | No. 3897 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 114, Nays 31, |
---|
20 | | - | 1 present, not voting. |
---|
21 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
22 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
23 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3897 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
24 | | - | amendments, on May 22, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays |
---|
25 | | - | 0. |
---|
26 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
27 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
28 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
29 | | - | Date |
---|
30 | | - | __________________ |
---|
31 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 22 | + | * * * * * |
---|