Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3923 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Oliverson, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Hancock) H.B. No. 3923
2- (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2021;
3- May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
4- Commerce; May 20, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:
5- Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 20, 2021, sent to printer.)
6-Click here to see the committee vote
1+87R19313 RDS-F
2+ By: Oliverson, Shaheen, Rogers, et al. H.B. No. 3923
73
84
95 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
106 AN ACT
117 relating to multiple employer welfare arrangements.
128 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
139 SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 846, Insurance Code, is
1410 amended by adding Section 846.0035 to read as follows:
1511 Sec. 846.0035. APPLICABILITY OF CERTAIN LAWS TO ASSOCIATION
1612 PROVIDING HEALTH BENEFITS. (a) This section applies only to a
1713 multiple employer welfare arrangement:
1814 (1) that was issued an initial certificate of
1915 authority under Section 846.054 on or after January 1, 2022; or
2016 (2) that elects to be bound by this section in the
2117 manner prescribed by the commissioner.
2218 (b) A multiple employer welfare arrangement that provides a
2319 comprehensive health benefit plan, as determined by the
2420 commissioner, is subject to the following laws as if the
2521 arrangement were an insurer, individuals entitled to coverage under
2622 the plan were insureds, and the health benefits were provided
2723 through an insurance policy:
2824 (1) Chapter 421;
2925 (2) Chapter 422;
3026 (3) Subchapters C, F, and K, Chapter 1451; and
3127 (4) Chapter 4201.
3228 (c) A multiple employer welfare arrangement that provides a
3329 comprehensive health benefit plan, as determined by the
3430 commissioner, that is determined by the commissioner to be
3531 structured in the manner of a preferred provider benefit plan or an
3632 exclusive provider benefit plan as defined in Section 1301.001 is
3733 subject to the following laws as if the arrangement were an insurer,
3834 individuals entitled to coverage under the plan were insureds, and
3935 the health benefits were provided through an insurance policy:
4036 (1) Chapter 1301; and
4137 (2) Chapter 1467.
4238 SECTION 2. Section 846.052(b), Insurance Code, is amended
4339 to read as follows:
4440 (b) The application form must be completed and submitted
4541 along with all information required by the commissioner, including:
4642 (1) a copy of each organizational document;
4743 (2) current financial statements of the arrangement;
4844 (3) a fully detailed statement indicating the plan
4945 under which the arrangement proposes to transact business;
5046 (4) an initial actuarial opinion in compliance with
5147 the requirements of Section 846.153(a)(2) and subject to Section
5248 846.157(b); and
5349 (5) demonstration [a statement] by the applicant
5450 [certifying] that the arrangement is in compliance with all
5551 applicable federal and state laws [provisions of the Employee
5652 Retirement Income Security Act of 1974 (29 U.S.C. Section 1001 et
5753 seq.)].
5854 SECTION 3. Section 846.053, Insurance Code, is amended by
5955 amending Subsections (b) and (c) and adding Subsection (d-1) to
6056 read as follows:
6157 (b) The employers in the multiple employer welfare
6258 arrangement must:
6359 (1) be members of an association or group of five or
6460 more businesses that are in the same trade or industry, including
6561 closely related businesses that provide support, services, or
6662 supplies primarily to that trade or industry; or
6763 (2) for a multiple employer welfare arrangement to
6864 which Section 846.0035 applies, each have a principal place of
6965 business in the same region that does not exceed the boundaries of
7066 this state or the boundaries of a metropolitan statistical area
7167 designated by the United States Office of Management and Budget.
7268 (c) If the employers in the multiple employer welfare
7369 arrangement are members of an association, the association must:
7470 (1) be engaged in substantial activity for its
7571 members other than sponsorship of an employee welfare benefit plan;
7672 and
7773 (2) if Section 846.0035 does not apply to the multiple
7874 employer welfare arrangement, have been in existence for at least
7975 two years before engaging in any activities relating to providing
8076 employee health benefits to its members.
8177 (d-1) For purposes of a multiple employer welfare
8278 arrangement to which Section 846.0035 applies, a working owner of a
8379 trade or business without employees may qualify as both an employer
8480 and as an employee of the trade or industry for the purposes of this
8581 section. In this subsection, "working owner" means an individual
8682 who:
8783 (1) has an ownership right of any nature in a trade or
8884 business, whether incorporated or unincorporated, including a
8985 partner and other self-employed individual;
9086 (2) earns wages or self-employment income from the
9187 trade or business for providing personal services to the trade or
9288 business; and
9389 (3) either:
9490 (A) works on average at least 20 hours per week or
9591 at least 80 hours per month providing personal services to the
9692 working owner's trade or business; or
9793 (B) has wages or self-employment income from the
9894 individual's trade or business that at least equals the
9995 individual's cost of coverage for participation by the individual
10096 and any covered beneficiaries in the group health plan sponsored by
10197 the group or association in which the individual is participating.
10298 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
103- * * * * *