Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3924 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 17, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 5, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 23, 2021
Fiscal Note May 12, 2021
Fiscal Note April 16, 2021
Fiscal Note April 6, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 13, 2021
Bill April 22, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 12, 2021
Analysis April 22, 2021