4 | 13 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 14 | | relating to the establishment of the industry-based certification |
---|
6 | 15 | | advisory council and the transfer of certain duties to that |
---|
7 | 16 | | advisory council. |
---|
8 | 17 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 18 | | SECTION 1. Subtitle B, Title 4, Labor Code, is amended by |
---|
10 | 19 | | adding Chapter 312 to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 20 | | CHAPTER 312. INDUSTRY-BASED CERTIFICATION ADVISORY COUNCIL |
---|
12 | 21 | | Sec. 312.001. DEFINITION. In this chapter, "advisory |
---|
13 | 22 | | council" means the industry-based certification advisory council |
---|
14 | 23 | | established under this chapter. |
---|
15 | 24 | | Sec. 312.002. ADVISORY COUNCIL. (a) The industry-based |
---|
16 | 25 | | certification advisory council is established to advise the |
---|
17 | 26 | | commission regarding the alignment of public high school career and |
---|
18 | 27 | | technology education programs with current and future workforce |
---|
19 | 28 | | needs in communities, regions, and the state. |
---|
20 | 29 | | (b) The advisory council is composed of the following nine |
---|
21 | 30 | | members: |
---|
22 | 31 | | (1) three members representing industry in this state, |
---|
23 | 32 | | one each appointed by the governor, the lieutenant governor, and |
---|
24 | 33 | | the speaker of the house of representatives; |
---|
25 | 34 | | (2) three members representing public school teachers |
---|
26 | 35 | | who teach career and technology education courses or public school |
---|
27 | 36 | | administrators, one each appointed by the governor, the lieutenant |
---|
28 | 37 | | governor, and the speaker of the house of representatives; and |
---|
29 | 38 | | (3) three members representing a public junior |
---|
30 | 39 | | college, public state college, or public technical institute, as |
---|
31 | 40 | | those terms are defined by Section 61.003, Education Code, one each |
---|
32 | 41 | | appointed by the governor, the lieutenant governor, and the speaker |
---|
33 | 42 | | of the house of representatives. |
---|
34 | 43 | | (c) The members of the advisory council serve staggered |
---|
35 | 44 | | four-year terms, with the terms of either four or five members |
---|
36 | 45 | | expiring February 1 of each odd-numbered year. |
---|
37 | 46 | | (c-1) Notwithstanding Subsection (c), the initial members |
---|
38 | 47 | | appointed shall determine by lot which four of the nine initial |
---|
39 | 48 | | members will serve terms that expire February 1, 2023, and which |
---|
40 | 49 | | five of the nine initial members will serve terms that expire |
---|
41 | 50 | | February 1, 2025. This subsection expires January 1, 2026. |
---|
42 | 51 | | (d) A vacancy on the advisory council shall be filled in the |
---|
43 | 52 | | same manner as the original appointment for that position. |
---|
44 | 53 | | (e) A member of the advisory council is not entitled to |
---|
45 | 54 | | compensation for service as a member of the advisory council but is |
---|
46 | 55 | | entitled to reimbursement for actual and necessary travel expenses |
---|
47 | 56 | | incurred in performing functions as a member of the advisory |
---|
48 | 57 | | council, as provided in the General Appropriations Act. |
---|
49 | 58 | | (f) Using existing resources, the commission shall provide |
---|
50 | 59 | | administrative and staff support for the advisory council. |
---|
51 | 60 | | SECTION 2. Section 29.189, Education Code, is transferred |
---|
52 | 61 | | to Chapter 312, Labor Code, as added by this Act, redesignated as |
---|
53 | 62 | | Section 312.003, Labor Code, and amended to read as follows: |
---|
54 | 63 | | Sec. 312.003. [Sec. 29.189.] INVENTORY OF CREDENTIALS AND |
---|
55 | 64 | | CERTIFICATES. (a) The advisory council [In this section: |
---|
56 | 65 | | [(1) "Commission" means the Texas Workforce |
---|
57 | 66 | | Commission. |
---|
58 | 67 | | [(2) "Coordinating board" means the Texas Higher |
---|
59 | 68 | | Education Coordinating Board. |
---|
60 | 69 | | [(b) The agency, the coordinating board, and the |
---|
61 | 70 | | commission] shall [jointly] develop [and post on their respective |
---|
62 | 71 | | Internet websites] an inventory of industry-recognized credentials |
---|
63 | 72 | | and certificates that may be earned by a public high school student |
---|
64 | 73 | | through a career and technology education program and that: |
---|
65 | 74 | | (1) are aligned to state and regional workforce needs; |
---|
66 | 75 | | and |
---|
67 | 76 | | (2) serve as an entry point to middle- and high-wage |
---|
68 | 77 | | jobs. |
---|
69 | 78 | | (b) [(c)] The inventory must include for each credential or |
---|
70 | 79 | | certificate: |
---|
71 | 80 | | (1) the associated career cluster; |
---|
72 | 81 | | (2) the awarding entity; |
---|
73 | 82 | | (3) the level of education required and any additional |
---|
74 | 83 | | requirements for the credential or certificate; |
---|
75 | 84 | | (4) any fees for obtaining the credential or |
---|
76 | 85 | | certificate; and |
---|
77 | 86 | | (5) the average wage or salary for jobs that require or |
---|
78 | 87 | | prefer the credential or certificate. |
---|
79 | 88 | | (c) In developing the inventory, the advisory council may |
---|
80 | 89 | | consult with local workforce boards, the Texas Workforce Investment |
---|
81 | 90 | | Council, the Texas Economic Development and Tourism Office, and the |
---|
82 | 91 | | Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board. |
---|
83 | 92 | | (d) The advisory council shall establish a process for |
---|
84 | 93 | | developing the inventory, including the criteria for the inclusion |
---|
85 | 94 | | of a credential or certificate in the inventory. |
---|
86 | 95 | | (e) The advisory council shall annually review and revise |
---|
87 | 96 | | the inventory. |
---|
88 | 97 | | (f) Each year, [the agency, the coordinating board, and] the |
---|
89 | 98 | | commission [jointly] shall: |
---|
90 | 99 | | (1) adopt [review] and, if necessary, review [update] |
---|
91 | 100 | | the inventory; and |
---|
92 | 101 | | (2) provide a copy of the inventory to the Texas |
---|
93 | 102 | | Education Agency and to each school district and public institution |
---|
94 | 103 | | of higher education that offers a career and technology education |
---|
95 | 104 | | program to public high school students. |
---|
96 | 105 | | SECTION 3. As soon as practicable after the effective date |
---|
97 | 106 | | of this Act but not later than January 1, 2022, the industry-based |
---|
98 | 107 | | certification advisory council established under Chapter 312, |
---|
99 | 108 | | Labor Code, as added by this Act, shall develop the initial |
---|
100 | 109 | | inventory required under that chapter. |
---|
101 | 110 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
102 | 111 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
103 | 112 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
104 | 113 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
105 | 114 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|