Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB396 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 9, 2020

Engrossed

Bill May 16, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 20, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 19, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 17, 2021
Fiscal Note March 29, 2021