Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4023 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/11/2021

                            87R13392 ANG-D
 By: Martinez H.B. No. 4023


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to establishing a pilot program to employ a life skills
 counselor at public high school campuses in certain counties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 33, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 33.010 to read as follows:
 Sec. 33.010.  LIFE SKILLS COUNSELOR PILOT PROGRAM. (a)  In
 this section:
 (1)  "Crime of violence" has the meaning assigned by
 Article 59.01, Code of Criminal Procedure.
 (2)  "Pilot program" means the life skills counselor
 pilot program established under this section.
 (b)  This section applies only to a county that:
 (1)  is adjacent to:
 (A)  at least two counties that border the Gulf of
 Mexico; and
 (B)  at least two counties that are located on the
 international border; and
 (2)  is located within 50 miles of a county described by
 Subdivision (1).
 (c)  The commissioner shall establish a life skills
 counselor pilot program at each high school campus located in a
 county subject to this section as a strategy for addressing
 emotional and mental health concerns of students.
 (d)  A school district located in a county subject to this
 section shall employ for each district high school campus located
 in the county a school counselor certified under Subchapter B,
 Chapter 21, to serve as a life skills counselor under the pilot
 program.
 (e)  A life skills counselor employed to serve at a high
 school campus under this section shall:
 (1)  collaborate with school district administrators,
 school counselors, social workers, other appropriately
 credentialed mental health professionals, and local law
 enforcement agencies to address mental health concerns affecting
 students at the high school campus;
 (2)  provide instruction to students enrolled at the
 high school campus relating to skills and techniques to cope with
 anxiety, frustration, and other emotions;
 (3)  counsel any students enrolled at the high school
 campus who have committed a crime of violence or are identified as
 having a mental health condition; and
 (4)  establish a voluntary counseling program for
 students enrolled at the high school campus.
 (f)  A school district located in a county subject to this
 section may solicit and accept a gift, grant, or donation from any
 source, including a foundation, private entity, governmental
 entity, or institution of higher education to implement or
 administer the pilot program.
 (g)  Not later than January 1, 2027, the commissioner shall
 review the pilot program established under this section and submit
 to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house
 of representatives, and the presiding officer of each legislative
 standing committee with primary jurisdiction over primary and
 secondary education a written report regarding the progress made by
 the pilot program in addressing emotional and mental health
 concerns of students.
 (h)  The commissioner shall adopt rules necessary to
 administer the pilot program.
 (i)  This section expires September 1, 2027.
 SECTION 2.  (a) Not later than December 1, 2021, the
 commissioner of education shall adopt rules necessary to implement
 and administer the life skills counselor pilot program established
 under Section 33.010, Education Code, as added by this Act.
 (b)  The life skills counselor pilot program established
 under Section 33.010, Education Code, as added by this Act, shall be
 implemented in each public high school located in a county subject
 to that section beginning with the 2022-2023 school year.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.