Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4030 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 11, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 30, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 19, 2021
Fiscal Note May 14, 2021
Fiscal Note May 12, 2021
Fiscal Note April 12, 2021
Fiscal Note April 6, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 14, 2021
Bill April 20, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 13, 2021
Analysis May 12, 2021
Analysis April 19, 2021