Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4036 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 18, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 14, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 13, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 12, 2021
Fiscal Note April 2, 2021