Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4067 Fiscal Note / Fiscal Note

Filed 04/20/2021

                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD     Austin, Texas       FISCAL NOTE, 87TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION             April 20, 2021       TO: Honorable Angie Chen Button, Chair, House Committee on International Relations & Economic Development     FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board      IN RE: HB4067 by Ordaz Perez (Relating to the designation, authority, and funding of the small business ombudsman program of the Texas Workforce Commission.), As Introduced     Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB4067, As Introduced : a negative impact of ($906,074) through the biennium ending August 31, 2023. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. General Revenue-Related Funds, Five- Year Impact: Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact toGeneral Revenue Related Funds2022($463,117)2023($442,957)2024($442,957)2025($442,957)2026($442,957)All Funds, Five-Year Impact: Fiscal Year Probable Savings/(Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1 Change in Number of State Employees from FY 20212022($463,117)4.02023($442,957)4.02024($442,957)4.02025($442,957)4.02026($442,957)4.0 Fiscal AnalysisThe bill would amend the Labor Code relating to the designation, authority, and funding of the small business ombudsman program of the Texas Workforce Commission (TWC). The bill would require TWC to hire a director to administer the activities of the small business ombudsman program. The bill would require TWC staff the program with a minimum of two qualified individuals. The bill would create a new Small Business Economic Ombudsman Fund. 

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 87TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 20, 2021

 

 

  TO: Honorable Angie Chen Button, Chair, House Committee on International Relations & Economic Development     FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board      IN RE: HB4067 by Ordaz Perez (Relating to the designation, authority, and funding of the small business ombudsman program of the Texas Workforce Commission.), As Introduced   

TO: Honorable Angie Chen Button, Chair, House Committee on International Relations & Economic Development
FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB4067 by Ordaz Perez (Relating to the designation, authority, and funding of the small business ombudsman program of the Texas Workforce Commission.), As Introduced

 Honorable Angie Chen Button, Chair, House Committee on International Relations & Economic Development

 Honorable Angie Chen Button, Chair, House Committee on International Relations & Economic Development

 Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board 

 Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board 

 HB4067 by Ordaz Perez (Relating to the designation, authority, and funding of the small business ombudsman program of the Texas Workforce Commission.), As Introduced 

 HB4067 by Ordaz Perez (Relating to the designation, authority, and funding of the small business ombudsman program of the Texas Workforce Commission.), As Introduced 



Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB4067, As Introduced : a negative impact of ($906,074) through the biennium ending August 31, 2023. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB4067, As Introduced : a negative impact of ($906,074) through the biennium ending August 31, 2023. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

General Revenue-Related Funds, Five- Year Impact: 


2022 ($463,117)
2023 ($442,957)
2024 ($442,957)
2025 ($442,957)
2026 ($442,957)

All Funds, Five-Year Impact: 


2022 ($463,117) 4.0
2023 ($442,957) 4.0
2024 ($442,957) 4.0
2025 ($442,957) 4.0
2026 ($442,957) 4.0

 Fiscal Analysis

The bill would amend the Labor Code relating to the designation, authority, and funding of the small business ombudsman program of the Texas Workforce Commission (TWC). The bill would require TWC to hire a director to administer the activities of the small business ombudsman program. The bill would require TWC staff the program with a minimum of two qualified individuals. The bill would create a new Small Business Economic Ombudsman Fund. 

 Methodology

According to TWC, the agency would need 4 full-time equivalent (FTE) positions to implement the provisions of the bill and administer the new program. These FTEs would result in a cost of $463,117 from General Revenue in fiscal year 2022 for salaries, benefits, equipment and all other operating expenses and $442,957 each fiscal year thereafter.Note: This legislation would do one or more of the following: create or recreate a dedicated account in the General Revenue Fund, create or recreate a special or trust fund either in, with, or outside of the Treasury, or create a dedicated revenue source. Legislative policy, implemented as Government Code 403.095, consolidated special funds (except those affected by constitutional, federal, or other restrictions) into the General Revenue Fund as of August 31, 1993 and eliminated all applicable statutory revenue dedications as of August 31, 1995. Each subsequent Legislature has reviewed bills that affect funds consolidation. The fund, account, or revenue dedication included in this bill would be subject to funds consolidation review by the current Legislature.



Note: This legislation would do one or more of the following: create or recreate a dedicated account in the General Revenue Fund, create or recreate a special or trust fund either in, with, or outside of the Treasury, or create a dedicated revenue source. Legislative policy, implemented as Government Code 403.095, consolidated special funds (except those affected by constitutional, federal, or other restrictions) into the General Revenue Fund as of August 31, 1993 and eliminated all applicable statutory revenue dedications as of August 31, 1995. Each subsequent Legislature has reviewed bills that affect funds consolidation. The fund, account, or revenue dedication included in this bill would be subject to funds consolidation review by the current Legislature.

 Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: b > td > 304 Comptroller of Public Accounts, 320 Texas Workforce Commission

304 Comptroller of Public Accounts, 320 Texas Workforce Commission

LBB Staff: b > td > JMc, SZ, MB, DFR

JMc, SZ, MB, DFR